The London Rifles Volunteer Trusts

Charity number: 210638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £12.87k £13.33k £17.99k £18.01k £12.27k
Total expenditure £7.02k £11.19k £8.07k £21.77k £17.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A