Trustees THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 211409
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malcolm Olver Chair 02 November 2015
None on record
Gill Taylor Trustee 08 March 2021
None on record
Helena Ellis Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
Laurence Mark Garside Trustee 31 October 2016
None on record
Rev MARK DEARNLEY Trustee 30 November 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, ST ALBANS
Received: On time
MARK WALLER Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, ST ALBANS
Received: On time
PETER KASER Trustee
None on record