BARTS AND THE LONDON CHARITY AND RELATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 212563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.05m £17.38m £19.62m £17.74m £19.77m
Total expenditure £28.60m £16.12m £33.75m £34.26m £32.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.37m £3.66m £4.22m £2.91m £4.84m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.68m £13.72m £15.40m £14.83m £14.94m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £660.00k £1.43m £1.98m £756.00k £762.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.74m £12.74m £30.19m £30.67m £28.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.86m £3.38m £3.56m £3.60m £3.78m
Expenditure - Governance £156.25k £129.10k £80.31k £186.81k £179.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £23.90m £10.66m £27.64m £27.97m £25.78m
Expenditure - Investment management £2.10m £2.48m £2.55m £2.63m £2.55m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0