CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 221124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £43.83m £41.61m £39.10m £49.05m £37.40m
Total expenditure £42.68m £39.60m £36.43m £37.71m £52.56m
Income from government contracts £9.04m £7.05m £4.90m £4.74m £3.71m
Income from government grants £1.57m £0 £0 £527.72k £217.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £23.11m £20.61m £17.40m £18.32m £15.79m
Income - Other trading activities £9.20m £9.91m £10.82m £11.51m £11.96m
Income - Charitable activities £10.61m £7.05m £9.95m £9.80m £9.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £1.33m £0
Income - Investment £157.00k £236.00k £243.00k £267.00k £253.00k
Income - Other £760.00k £3.80m £0 £9.16m £0
Income - Legacies £6.32m £5.13m £6.79m £8.14m £6.26m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.60m £25.76m £18.90m £19.27m £32.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.08m £13.85m £16.99m £18.42m £19.68m
Expenditure - Governance £303.00k £209.00k £354.00k £424.00k £453.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £99.00k £21.00k £65.00k