CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 221124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amelia Tasneem Torode Trustee 06 November 2018 None on record
DAVID RAMSDEN Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
Nasima Patel Trustee 08 September 2016
HAMPSHIRE GIRLS' AND BOYS' HOME Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION OF SAFEGUARDING PARTNERS Received: On time
CHRIS GILLIES Trustee 18 September 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALDATES, OXFORD Received: On time
WESTMINSTER THEOLOGICAL CENTRE Received: On time
Helen Keppel-Compton Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Diane Blausten Trustee 06 November 2018
HAMPSHIRE GIRLS' AND BOYS' HOME Received: On time
Stuart Duncan Trustee 06 November 2018
HAMPSHIRE GIRLS' AND BOYS' HOME Received: On time
Deborah Harris-Ugbomah Trustee 06 November 2019 None on record
Janet Legrand Chair 20 September 2013
HAMPSHIRE GIRLS' AND BOYS' HOME Received: On time
ADVANCE HE Received: On time
Sarah Payne Trustee 06 November 2019 None on record
Jim Clifford Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
The Rt Revd Elizabeth Lane Trustee 17 March 2016 None on record
Sam Monaghan Trustee 06 November 2019 None on record
Florence Kroll Trustee 06 November 2019 None on record