SIGHT SUPPORT HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 223668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time Download