Trustees ST JOHN'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 230417
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL BAKER MBE Chair
None on record
Elizabeth Irving Trustee 30 January 2019
None on record
Rev Jon Randall Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
CLLR ANN BLACKWELL Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
CLLR SARAH GIFFORD Trustee 25 June 2015
None on record
LESLIE BUTTON Trustee 12 July 2012
None on record
ALAN BUTLER Trustee
HUNTINGDONSHIRE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: 2 days late
THE HINCHINGBROOKE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ST NEOTS AND HUNTINGDON METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
TIM JOHNSON Trustee
None on record
DAPHNE PEACOCK Trustee
None on record
CHARLES FREDERICK SAUNDERS Trustee
None on record