GEMILUTH CHESED AND ENDOWMENT OF BRIDES SOCIETY

Charity number: 253388
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 February 2018 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 February 2018 113 days late Download