THE HIGH WYCOMBE SOCIETY

Charity number: 257897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.33k £8.03k £12.59k £7.73k £4.73k
Total expenditure £14.79k £7.59k £11.83k £6.44k £3.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £1.50k N/A N/A