Accounts and annual returns PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 263223
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 February 2020 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window