TRINITY IN CAMBERWELL

Charity number: 279447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 23 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 14 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 07 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 07 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 16 January 2017 On time Download