Financial history UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL SCHOOL OF LAW APPEAL

Charity number: 288190
Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £1.27k £831 £2.00k £878 £30
Total expenditure £6.45k £3.90k £4.55k £2.97k £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A