Governing document UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL SCHOOL OF LAW APPEAL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1983, AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 9 FEBRUARY 2007. AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2009. AS AMENDED ON 06 MAR 2018 as amended on 08 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE SCHOOL OF LAW AT THE UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL, BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE ADVICE OF THE BOARD OF THE SCHOOL OF LAW SHALL DETERMINE AND THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE RESEARCH SHALL BE PUBLISHED.
Area of benefit
SCHOOL OF LAW AT THE UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.