Accounts and annual returns THE WELLINGTON COLLEGE

Charity number: 309093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 03 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 August 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 25 August 2020 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 July 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 11 July 2019 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window