Governing document THE WELLINGTON COLLEGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 13/12/1853 SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 24/12/1855, 04/02/1861, 20/03/1952, 22/07/1960,27/1/2006 AND BYE-LAWS 27/1/2006.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE FOUNDATIONERS (CHILDREN OF DECEASED SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN OF HM ARMED FORCES AND SUCH OTHER CHILDREN OF DECEASED PERSONS WHO, IN THE SOLE OPINION OF THE GOVERNORS, HAVE DIED IN ACTS OF SELFLESS BRAVERY) AND OTHERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.