CULHAM ST GABRIEL'S TRUST

Charity number: 309671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Georgiou Trustee 08 December 2021
HILL HOLT WOOD Received: On time
CANON DR ANN HOLT Trustee 04 April 2017 None on record
Linda Whitworth Trustee 27 November 2014 None on record
NANSI ELLIS Trustee 24 November 2016 None on record
DEBORAH WESTON OBE Trustee 18 December 2012
RELIGIOUS EDUCATION COUNCIL OF ENGLAND AND WALES Received: On time
Tony Wilson Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
MARCUS COOPER Trustee 03 September 2018 None on record
REVD CANON PETER BALLARD Trustee 24 November 2016
THE NATIONAL SOCIETY (CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND CHURCH IN WALES) FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION Received: On time
JAMES COWEN Trustee 24 April 2013 None on record
JOHN KEAST OBE Chair None on record
Rev Mark Bennet Trustee 13 December 2021 None on record
Dr Robert Andrew Bowie Trustee 02 April 2020 None on record
Rev NIGEL GENDERS Trustee 01 September 2014
ST CHRISTOPHER'S EDUCATIONAL TRUST (INCORPORATING THE HUGHES AND STEVENS BEQUEST) Received: On time
Lee Coley Trustee 17 December 2020
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY Received: On time