EMMAUS GREENWICH

Charity number: 1064472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 13 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 13 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 31 May 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 31 May 2019 31 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 30 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 30 March 2017 On time Download