INTERCONTINENTAL CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1072584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £607.68k £715.79k £630.35k £491.48k £497.65k
Total expenditure £488.29k £703.85k £739.41k £610.13k £581.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £532.43k £631.74k £546.82k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £2.61k £2.73k £3.74k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £11.13k £13.17k £15.29k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £60.68k £61.69k £63.78k N/A N/A
Income - Other £817 £6.47k £723 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £223.56k £53.83k £103.58k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £406.80k £619.53k £667.97k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £81.49k £84.33k £71.44k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £16.53k £5.50k £7.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £11.09k £11.23k £10.84k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A