LIZARD CHILD TRUST (COMMUNITY HELP IMPROVING LEARNING AND DEVELOPMENT)

Charity number: 1076871
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 September 2020 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 September 2020 87 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 04 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 04 April 2017 On time Download