MID MEDIATION AND COUNSELLING LTD

Charity number: 1076166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 09 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 04 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 22 March 2017 On time Download