Trustees REFUGEE RESOURCE

Charity number: 1098876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BELINDA JANE COOTE Chair 01 January 2017
None on record
David Francis Waller Trustee 20 June 2022
PUMP AID
Received: On time
Nuha Abdo Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Naznin Ali Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Andrew Tyson Trustee 22 June 2020
None on record
Michael Taylor Trustee 03 September 2018
MEET IN OXFORD
Received: On time
OXFORD AND DISTRICT MENCAP
Received: On time
Adiba Malo Trustee 03 September 2018
None on record
Kenneth King Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record