MATCHBOX DAY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1103781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 August 2017 On time Download