Accounts and annual returns THE SOCIETY OF BOTANICAL ARTISTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1110869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window