Financial history THE SOCIETY OF BOTANICAL ARTISTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1110869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £196.11k £184.67k £219.97k £207.34k £192.33k
Total expenditure £137.00k £184.49k £190.19k £140.04k £175.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A