BOURNEMOUTH BLIND SOCIETY

Charity number: 1114570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £299.73k £225.44k £168.19k £223.97k £176.05k
Total expenditure £260.56k £175.79k £200.66k £196.96k £163.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £23.00k
Income from government grants £20.00k £20.00k £18.00k £19.24k N/A