SGA COMMUNITY SERVICES LTD

Charity number: 1119486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time Download