JUST FOR KIDS LAW LIMITED

Charity number: 1121638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sufina Ahmad Trustee 28 February 2019
ASSOCIATION OF CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS Received: On time
SUTTON'S HOSPITAL IN CHARTERHOUSE Received: On time
Sophia Wiginton Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
Maureen Andrea Cole-Burns Trustee 28 February 2018 None on record
Wendy Brewer Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Claire Hubberstey Trustee 28 February 2019 None on record
Peter George Gibbs Trustee 15 October 2015
THE CYNARA FOUNDATION Received: On time
Anthony David Landes Chair 15 October 2015 None on record
Joanne Cecil Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Amira Bhatt Trustee 30 November 2017 None on record