BRISTOL REFUGEE RIGHTS

Charity number: 1126646
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £353.84k £412.34k £488.41k £575.25k £555.32k
Total expenditure £308.27k £377.09k £416.93k £490.29k £483.17k
Income from government contracts £14.05k £0 N/A N/A £18.71k
Income from government grants £25.55k £49.81k £60.66k £63.63k £68.86k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £550.77k £529.34k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £15.56k £5.61k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £7.86k £19.41k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.06k £969
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £459.39k £442.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £30.90k £40.76k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £4.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0