Trustees BRISTOL REFUGEE RIGHTS
Charity number: 1126646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirill Babeev | Chair | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henry Logan | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Milloy | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Nforbuh Asangmbe | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elise Ford | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Macharia | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maria Williams | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mano Candappa | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Natasha Carver | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Irene Zikusoka | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.