Governance GREAT WESTERN AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY
Charity number: 1121300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 19 October 2007: Standard registration
- 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
- 17 August 2021: Funds received from 278558 THE ALBERT EDWARD PASH CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
- 24 March 2023: Funds received from 1137388 HENRY SURTEES FOUNDATION
- 19 December 2023: Funds received from 1178272 NAILSEA LIONS CLUB
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.