GREAT WESTERN AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY

Charity number: 1121300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caroline Ann Peters MBE Peters Trustee 21 September 2016 None on record
Simon James Davies Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Simon Robin Jaques Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Karen Edgington Trustee 22 March 2018 None on record
John David Rigby Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Martyn William Drake Chair 06 July 2017 None on record
Dr Matthew Thomas Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
John Houlden Trustee 02 December 2015 None on record
Professor Jonathan Richard Benger Trustee 15 January 2015 None on record