MULTI AGENCY INTERNATIONAL TRAINING AND SUPPORT

Charity number: 1126268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 10 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 03 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 03 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 07 April 2017 On time Download