Accounts and annual returns HERNE BAY PIER TRUST

Charity number: 1128253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 20 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 07 October 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 07 October 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 22 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 September 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 27 September 2018 27 days late Download Open in new window