ST ANTHONYS PROJECT FOR HOMELESS ADDICTS

Charity number: 1128362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 07 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 17 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 17 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 14 December 2019 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 14 December 2019 105 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 21 September 2017 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 September 2017 21 days late Download