THE UROLOGY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 September 2017 On time Download