Accounts and annual returns SOUTH WEST TYNESIDE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1133266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window