THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BIDEFORD

Charity number: 1129064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 September 2017 On time Download