THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DENYS, LISVANE

Charity number: 1131310
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 April 2016 On time Download