THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST MATTHEW, CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1131805
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 December 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 December 2020 38 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 December 2019 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 December 2019 60 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 March 2017 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 24 March 2017 144 days late Download