THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EARLEY ST. NICOLAS

Charity number: 1138037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 December 2018 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 December 2018 41 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 November 2017 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 November 2017 17 days late Download