Accounts and annual returns BOSTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 13 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 08 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window