BABA BUDHA JI EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1138700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 March 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 March 2020 45 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2019 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 September 2019 215 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 April 2018 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 April 2018 72 days late Download