SOUTHWARK DAY CENTRE FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1143912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 March 2019 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 April 2019 61 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download