UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1148212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 15 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 09 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 09 November 2016 On time Download