BELIEVERS' GENERATION OF BELIEVERS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 18 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 24 September 2019 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 24 September 2019 24 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 26 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 26 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 04 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 04 August 2017 On time Download