BARDSLEY YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1152836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019
Annual return 30 September 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 20 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 02 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 16 February 2017 On time Download