Accounts and annual returns RELEASE FINANCIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1155290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window