Accounts and annual returns STOCKPORT MUSLIM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163915
Charity reporting is up to date (157 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 06 March 2023 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 06 March 2023 157 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 08 October 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 08 October 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 11 March 2020 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 11 March 2020 163 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 29 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window