Trustees Vulnerable Persons Interventions
Charity number: 1170330
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELI CHUKWUMERENKA BENSON | Chair | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
NGOZI IGWE | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Uchenna Cletu Njoku phd | Trustee | 27 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Nwabueze Nwogbe peterson | Trustee | 27 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PRINCE CHIDIEBERE EBIGBO | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sufyan Khan | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHIUDDIN RAZA | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANN ADAMS | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALANG'O | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ARLETTE RURIHAFI | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
SANJIV GABBI | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
USOBUNADU IFEANYICHUKWU URAIH | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHINEDUM BIDEMI CHIMBO | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.