Accounts and annual returns FOREST HARVEST

Charity number: 1172085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 14 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 November 2019 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 15 November 2019 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 October 2018 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 09 November 2018 102 days late Download Open in new window